SD HB1088 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 14. S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 14. S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the use of certain electronic devices while driving.
Title
Prohibit the use of certain electronic devices while driving.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] |
Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] |
Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 14. S.J. 472 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 463 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 17. S.J. 462 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 425 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 332 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 30. H.J. 311 |
2019-02-05 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 290 |
2019-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 189 |