SD HB1088 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and consolidate certain civil forfeiture provisions.
Title
Revise and consolidate certain civil forfeiture provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to another day (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to another day (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 871 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 607 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 14. H.J. 853 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 566 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 566 Amendment 1088ye |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 532 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088yd |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 452 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 28. H.J. 681 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 29. H.J. 681 |
2016-02-24 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 674 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 46, NAYS 21. H.J. 674 |
2016-02-22 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 615 |
2016-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-05 | House | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-05 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088yb |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 161 |