SD HB1086 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allow succession to real property by an affidavit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow succession to real property by an affidavit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary: Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
2021-02-17HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. Amendment 1086A
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-08HouseJudiciary Deferred to another day, Passed
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 119

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback