SD HB1086 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create a leased residential property classification.
Title
Create a leased residential property classification.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Haggar [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] |
Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Alex Jensen [R] | Rep. Patrick Kirschman [D] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Ried Holien [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 278 |
2016-02-03 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 266 |
2016-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 39. H.J. 266 |
2016-01-28 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 3. H.J. 208 |
2016-01-28 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1086jb |
2016-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 151 |