SD HB1082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the motor vehicle excise tax on vehicles leased for more than twenty-eight days to include certain off-road vehicles.
Title
Revise the motor vehicle excise tax on vehicles leased for more than twenty-eight days to include certain off-road vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Sen. Julie Frye-Mueller [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626 |
2022-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2022 H.J. 498 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 416 |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 483 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 380 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 183 |
2022-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 197 |
2022-02-01 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1082B |
2022-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 40 |