SD HB1082 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain state aid to education definitions for the 2021-2022 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain state aid to education definitions for the 2021-2022 school year.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseSigned by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
2021-02-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 270
2021-02-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 229
2021-02-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 247
2021-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201
2021-02-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
2021-02-04SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 143
2021-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 155
2021-01-27HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-27HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0.
2021-01-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 119

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback