SD HB1082 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To revise certain provisions regarding scrap metal purchases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise certain provisions regarding scrap metal purchases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-22SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 485
2019-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 461
2019-02-20SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 414
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 264
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 283
2019-01-30HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 246
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 188

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback