SD HB1081 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-12)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain paraplegic or amputee veterans or their surviving spouses to retain a property tax exemption without having to reapply each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain paraplegic or amputee veterans or their surviving spouses to retain a property tax exemption without having to reapply each year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
2019-03-06SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 551
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-27SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 536
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 350
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 359
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 346
2019-02-06HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 320
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 172

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback