SD HB1080 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the enhanced penalty for the crime of simple assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the enhanced penalty for the crime of simple assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2021-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 442
2021-03-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 1
2021-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 365
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 26. H.J. 423
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 423 Amendment 1080C
2021-02-24HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 1
2021-02-24HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1080A
2021-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 109

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback