SD HB1076 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 H.J. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 H.J. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit certain municipalities to elect aldermen at large.
Title
Permit certain municipalities to elect aldermen at large.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 H.J. 290 |
2022-02-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 10, 2022 H.J. 256 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 227 |
2022-02-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 240 |
2022-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 221 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 176 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 175 Amendment 1076B |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 105 |
2022-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 19. H.J. 107 |
2022-01-20 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2022-01-20 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. Amendment 1076A |
2022-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 34 |