SD HB1075 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the membership of the Legislative Planning Committee.
Title
Revise the membership of the Legislative Planning Committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Rep. Kristin Conzet [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] |
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 814 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 703 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 742 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 2. H.J. 633 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 608 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 550 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1075yb |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 247 |
2013-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 194 |
2013-01-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 146 |
2013-01-23 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1075ta |
2013-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 93 |