SD HB1071 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise and repeal provisions regarding aviation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise and repeal provisions regarding aviation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
2019-03-04SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-28SenateSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 558
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 501
2019-02-22SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-22SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 469
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 367
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 375
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
2019-02-07HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 323
2019-02-07HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1071oa
2019-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 169

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback