SD HB1071 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change the procedure for a minor boundary change.
Title
Change the procedure for a minor boundary change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 780 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 648 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 732 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 597 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 569 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 291 |
2014-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 21. H.J. 358 |
2014-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 341 |
2014-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 325 |
2014-02-05 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. H.J. 289 |
2014-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 59 |