SD HB1070 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the voidability of gambling contracts.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the voidability of gambling contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Signed by Governor H.J. 694 | |
2010-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 619 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 467 | |
2010-02-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 427 | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 210 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 250 | |
2010-01-27 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 191 | |
2010-01-27 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. Amendment 1070ra | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 108 |