SD HB1068 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the processing of sexual assault kits performed on individuals ages sixteen and seventeen.
Title
Clarify the processing of sexual assault kits performed on individuals ages sixteen and seventeen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 538 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 519 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 438 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1068B |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 181 |
2022-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 195 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 153 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. Amendment 1068A |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 91 |
2022-01-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 47 |
2022-01-19 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 29 |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading House H.J. 25 |