SD HB1067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 40-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 205
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modify certain provisions regarding notice, service, and execution of judgments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify certain provisions regarding notice, service, and execution of judgments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 205
2020-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 260
2020-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 260 Amendment 1067F
2020-02-07HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-02-07HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1067E
2020-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-21HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 35

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback