SD HB1065 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Signed by the Speaker H.J. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the emergency medical personnel licensure interstate compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the emergency medical personnel licensure interstate compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 467
2021-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 436
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0.
2021-02-17SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-17SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-17SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 1065A
2021-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-09SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 224
2021-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 238
2021-02-05HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-05HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28HouseReferred to House Commerce and Energy, Passed H.J. 148
2021-01-19HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 35

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback