SD HB1064 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize temporary appointments to the State Government Accountability Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize temporary appointments to the State Government Accountability Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-14SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-13SenateSigned by the President S.J. 373
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 382
2019-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-08SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 250
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 268
2019-01-29HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 235
2019-01-28HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-28HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 216
2019-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 159

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback