SD HB1061 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit smoking and consuming marijuana and its derivatives in a motor vehicle and create a penalty therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit smoking and consuming marijuana and its derivatives in a motor vehicle and create a penalty therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Motion to amend (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 568
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 528
2021-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 525
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 450
2021-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 418
2021-03-03SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 0, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 350
2021-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 384
2021-02-22HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 1
2021-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1061G
2021-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 3 Amendment 1061B
2021-02-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 31

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback