SD HB1061 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt vehicles owned by improvement districts from certain vehicle registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt vehicles owned by improvement districts from certain vehicle registration fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateSigned by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
2020-02-18SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 18, 2020 H.J. 294
2020-02-13SenateSigned by the President S.J. 233
2020-02-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 275
2020-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 190
2020-02-10SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-02-10SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2020-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 121
2020-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 7. H.J. 83
2020-01-28HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-01-28HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
2020-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-21HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 37
2020-01-17HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback