SD HB1061 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions related to the regulation of captive insurance companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions related to the regulation of captive insurance companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-25SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 842
2013-03-07SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 814
2013-03-06SenateSigned by President S.J. 703
2013-03-05SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 742
2013-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 651
2013-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 630
2013-02-27SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
2013-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 201
2013-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 140
2013-01-18HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 106
2013-01-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 32

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback