SD HB1061 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding organization and operation of the public entity pool for liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding organization and operation of the public entity pool for liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-10 Signed by Governor H.J. 800
2010-03-08 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 755
2010-03-04 Signed by President S.J. 573
2010-03-03 Signed by Speaker H.J. 688
2010-03-02 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 510
2010-03-01 Placed on consent, Passed
2010-03-01 State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 485
2010-03-01 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-24 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-27 First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 153
2010-01-26 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 181
2010-01-26 House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 181 Amendment 1061ja
2010-01-25 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 170
2010-01-22 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 163
2010-01-21 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 154
2010-01-20 State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 134
2010-01-20 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-12 First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 30

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback