SD HB1060 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Signed by Governor H.J. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Signed by Governor H.J. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding military speciality plates.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding military speciality plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 564 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 477 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 373 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 441 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 332 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 306 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 172 |
2014-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 164 |
2014-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 164 Amendment 1060oe |
2014-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 130 |
2014-01-23 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 76 |
2014-01-23 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1060oa |
2014-01-23 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1060od |
2014-01-23 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1060oc |
2014-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 27 |
Subjects
Class 1 Misdemeanor
Class 2 Misdemeanor
Licenses
Military Affairs
Motor Vehicle
Prison or Jail Impact Statement
Class 2 Misdemeanor
Licenses
Military Affairs
Motor Vehicle
Prison or Jail Impact Statement