SD HB1059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 09, 2022 H.J. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 09, 2022 H.J. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit nonresponsive insurance producer applications be deemed withdrawn as to not constitute a refusal or administrative action.
Title
Permit nonresponsive insurance producer applications be deemed withdrawn as to not constitute a refusal or administrative action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 09, 2022 H.J. 242 |
2022-02-02 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 02, 2022 H.J. 176 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 154 |
2022-01-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 162 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 117 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 90 |
2022-01-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 47 |
2022-01-19 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-01-19 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 21 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |