SD HB1059 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding hunting with drones.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding hunting with drones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 25, 2020 H.J. 374 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 327 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 352 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 294 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 175 |
2020-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 227 |
2020-02-06 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-06 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 38 |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading House H.J. 26 |