SD HB1057 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish resident tuition requirements for veterans and armed forces personnel and family members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish resident tuition requirements for veterans and armed forces personnel and family members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 528
2021-03-02HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 02, 2021 H.J. 455
2021-03-01SenateSigned by the President S.J. 369
2021-02-25HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 431
2021-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 341
2021-02-23SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
2021-02-23SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 260
2021-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 286
2021-02-08HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
2021-02-08HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057B
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 31
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 25

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback