SD HB1057 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the definition of attest for the purposes of public accountancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the definition of attest for the purposes of public accountancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-13SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 399
2019-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 0. S.J. 357
2019-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 336
2019-02-08SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 233
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 235
2019-01-25HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 181
2019-01-25HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057ya
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 145

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback