SD HB1057 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the provision that requires the county auditor to assist in locating unregistered mobile homes.
Title
Repeal the provision that requires the county auditor to assist in locating unregistered mobile homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Signed by Governor H.J. 650 | |
2011-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 515 | |
2011-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 484 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 469 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-16 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 443 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 280 | |
2011-01-31 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 238 | |
2011-01-27 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 127 |