SD HB1056 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 43. H.J. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the designation of Purple Star schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the designation of Purple Star schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 43. H.J. 133
2021-01-25HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 1
2021-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 34
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback