SD HB1055 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the dollar amount of South Dakota opportunity scholarships.
Title
Increase the dollar amount of South Dakota opportunity scholarships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - Referred to (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - Referred to (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 545 |
2023-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 H.J. 509 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 395 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 302 |
2023-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 316 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2023-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 23 |