SD HB1055 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the termination of a political committee under certain circumstances.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the termination of a political committee under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Local Government Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Local Government Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 18, 2020 H.J. 294 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 233 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 275 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 190 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 121 |
2020-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 86 |
2020-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 86 Amendment 1055B |
2020-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 51 |
2020-01-21 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. |
2020-01-21 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. Amendment 1055A |
2020-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 27 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |