SD HB1055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require parental notification and agreement before the institution of an order to withhold resuscitation from certain patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require parental notification and agreement before the institution of an order to withhold resuscitation from certain patients.

Sponsors

Rep. Fred Deutsch [R]Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]Rep. Roger Chase [R]Rep. Drew Dennert [R]
Rep. Michael Diedrich [R]Rep. Caleb Finck [R]Rep. Julie Frye-mueller [R]Rep. Bob Glanzer [R]
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R]Rep. Spencer Gosch [R]Rep. Lana Greenfield [R]Rep. Dayle Hammock [R]
Rep. Jon Hansen [R]Rep. Steven Haugaard [R]Rep. Taffy Howard [R]Rep. Kevin Jensen [R]
Rep. Timothy Johns [R]Rep. Chris Johnson [R]Rep. David Johnson [R]Rep. Lance Koth [R]
Rep. John Lake [R]Rep. Isaac Latterell [R]Rep. Sam Marty [R]Rep. Steven McCleerey [D]
Rep. Rhonda Milstead [R]Rep. Paul Miskimins [R]Rep. Tina Mulally [R]Rep. Carl Perry [R]
Rep. Kent Peterson [R]Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R]Rep. Tom Pischke [R]Rep. Doug Post [R]
Rep. Lee Qualm [R]Rep. Tony Randolph [R]Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R]Rep. Tim Rounds [R]
Rep. Kyle Schoenfish [R]Rep. Manny Steele [R]Rep. Kaleb Weis [R]Rep. Marli Wiese [R]
Rep. Mark Willadsen [R]Rep. Nancy York [R]Rep. Larry Zikmund [R]Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R]
Sen. Rocky Blare [R]Sen. Jim Bolin [R]Sen. Gary Cammack [R]Sen. Justin Cronin [R]
Sen. Lynn Disanto [R]Sen. Bob Ewing [R]Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Sen. Phil Jensen [R]
Sen. Joshua Klumb [R]Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R]Sen. Kris Langer [R]Sen. Ryan Maher [R]
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R]Sen. Stace Nelson [R]Sen. Al Novstrup [R]Sen. Ernie Otten [R]
Sen. Jeff Partridge [R]Sen. Arthur Rusch [R]Sen. Lance Russell [R]Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R]
Sen. VJ Smith [R]Sen. Alan Solano [R]Sen. Jim Stalzer [R]Sen. Billie Sutton [D]
Sen. John Wiik [R]Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 662
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-27SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 532
2019-02-27SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1055ba
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 279
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 297
2019-01-31HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 276
2019-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 140

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1055&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1055P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1055SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1055ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27699&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27797&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28930&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29109&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29268&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback