SD HB1053 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the issuance of a written certification to a pregnant woman or breastfeeding mother for purposes of medical cannabis use.
Title
Prohibit the issuance of a written certification to a pregnant woman or breastfeeding mother for purposes of medical cannabis use.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Rep. Mary Fitzgerald [R] |
Sen. Julie Frye-Mueller [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Rep. Karla Lems [R] | Rep. John Mills [R] |
Rep. Scott Moore [R] | Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Rep. Neal Pinnow [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 547 |
2023-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 H.J. 509 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 412 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 127 |
2023-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 106 |
2023-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 105 Amendment 1053B |
2023-01-24 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2023-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 23 |