SD HB1053 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-2)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish an annual fee for certain electric motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish an annual fee for certain electric motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
2021-02-25HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 398
2021-02-24SenateSigned by the President S.J. 344
2021-02-23HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 354
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 317
2021-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 297
2021-02-17SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2021-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 172
2021-02-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 181
2021-01-28HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-01-28HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1053A
2021-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 34
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback