SD HB1052 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2020 H.J. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Change a reference from a secondary election to a runoff election to maintain consistency in terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change a reference from a secondary election to a runoff election to maintain consistency in terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateSigned by the Governor on February 06, 2020 H.J. 220
2020-02-04SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 04, 2020 H.J. 111
2020-01-30SenateSigned by the President S.J. 122
2020-01-29SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 86
2020-01-28SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 100
2020-01-27SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-01-27SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2020-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 67
2020-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 43
2020-01-21HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-01-21HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2020-01-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-16HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 25
2020-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback