SD HB1052 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of full-time equivalent to exclude students employed by public postsecondary institutions.
Title
Revise the definition of full-time equivalent to exclude students employed by public postsecondary institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Signed by Governor H.J. 800 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 14. S.J. 524 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 481 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 465 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 449 | |
2010-02-22 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 392 | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 248 | |
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 22. H.J. 299 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 277 | |
2010-01-28 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1052toa | |
2010-01-28 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. H.J. 212 | |
2010-01-28 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1052oa | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 28 |