SD HB1049 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2023.
Title
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2023.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544 |
2023-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2023 H.J. 541 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2023-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 542 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 1. S.J. 489 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 |
2023-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 539 |
2023-03-09 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 538 |
2023-03-09 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. |
2023-03-09 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1049A |
2023-03-09 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-03-09 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 2 |
2023-03-08 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 2 |
2023-03-02 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 24 |
2023-01-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 14 |