SD HB1047 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateSigned by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435
2020-02-24SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 358
2020-02-21SenateSigned by the President S.J. 316
2020-02-20SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 340
2020-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 259
2020-02-18SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2020-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-10SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 175
2020-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 231
2020-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 220
2020-02-05HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2020-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-16HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 27
2020-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback