SD HB1047 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding recommendations for treatment as a condition for probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding recommendations for treatment as a condition for probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-20SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 454
2019-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 403
2019-02-14SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-14SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 381
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 201
2019-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 209
2019-01-23HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 156
2019-01-23HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1047wa
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 51

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback