SD HB1047 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding recommendations for treatment as a condition for probation.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding recommendations for treatment as a condition for probation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 527 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 454 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 381 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 201 |
2019-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 209 |
2019-01-23 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 156 |
2019-01-23 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1047wa |
2019-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 51 |