SD HB1047 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain reversion provisions relating to the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2013.
Title
Revise certain reversion provisions relating to the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 783 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 770 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 711 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 730 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 653 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 643 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 627 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 612 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 590 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 544 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 303 |
2015-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 296 |
2015-01-30 | House | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1047mta |
2015-01-30 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 240 |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 39 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 31 |