SD HB1047 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain prairie dog shooting season provisions.
Title
Revise certain prairie dog shooting season provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Signed by Governor H.J. 694 | |
2011-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 585 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 555 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 520 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 450 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 7. H.J. 403 | |
2011-02-14 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 384 | |
2011-02-10 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 352 | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 112 |