SD HB1047 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain powers of the state as conservator of a protected person.
Title
Clarify certain powers of the state as conservator of a protected person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Signed by Governor H.J. 800 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 648 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 478 | |
2010-02-23 | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1047rtb | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 428 | |
2010-02-23 | Judiciary Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1047rf | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 230 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 271 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 248 | |
2010-01-27 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 190 | |
2010-01-27 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1047oa | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-20 | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed | |
2010-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 27 |