SD HB1046 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the attorney recruitment assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the attorney recruitment assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 609
2019-03-04SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 595
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 546
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 273
2019-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3.
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 191
2019-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 23. H.J. 174
2019-01-23HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 156
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 51

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1046&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1046P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1046ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27372&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27435&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27696&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27819&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28998&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29168&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback