SD HB1044 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain children who are subject to a pending military relocation to apply for enrollment in a school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain children who are subject to a pending military relocation to apply for enrollment in a school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 386
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 358
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 319
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-07SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 300
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 214
2019-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 223
2019-01-23HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 166
2019-01-23HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1044cc
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17HouseReferred to House Military and Veterans Affairs, Passed H.J. 140
2019-01-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 51

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback