SD HB1040 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund certain small meat processor grants and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund certain small meat processor grants and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Tabled (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 401 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2021-02-23 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1040B |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040A |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 1 |
Subjects
Agriculture and Horticulture
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Grants
Meat and Meat Products
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Grants
Meat and Meat Products