SD HB1040 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the licensing of a professional counselor, professional counselor-mental health, or marriage and family therapist licensed in another state under certain circumstances and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide for the licensing of a professional counselor, professional counselor-mental health, or marriage and family therapist licensed in another state under certain circumstances and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 02, 2018 H.J. 310 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 338 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 266 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 258 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 219 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 178 |
2018-01-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 0. H.J. 119 |
2018-01-18 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 88 |
2018-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 24 |