SD HB1038 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the demolition of a South Dakota State University building and to make an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the demolition of a South Dakota State University building and to make an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSigned by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-08SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 08, 2019 H.J. 336
2019-02-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 305
2019-02-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 311
2019-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 267
2019-01-31SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 256
2019-01-30SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 239
2019-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 214
2019-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 224
2019-01-25HouseJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. H.J. 179
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback