SD HB1037 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 H.J. 318
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the increase of certain fees by the State Electrical Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the increase of certain fees by the State Electrical Commission.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseSigned by the Governor on February 18, 2021 H.J. 318
2021-02-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 11, 2021 H.J. 283
2021-02-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 242
2021-02-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 257
2021-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 213
2021-02-05SenateRemoved from Consent Calendar S.J. 202
2021-02-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-04SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 143
2021-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 15. H.J. 158
2021-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 157 Amendment 1037A
2021-01-27HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-01-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback