SD HB1036 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 H.J. 336
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions related to the Board of Technical Professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions related to the Board of Technical Professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the Governor on February 8, 2019 H.J. 336
2019-02-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 05, 2019 H.J. 288
2019-01-31SenateSigned by the President S.J. 256
2019-01-30SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 273
2019-01-29SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 216
2019-01-28SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-28SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 196
2019-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 157
2019-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 148
2019-01-17HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141
2019-01-16HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-16HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 128
2019-01-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback